Global patent index - EP 1030062 A2

EP 1030062 A2 2000-08-23 - Turbo-molecular pump

Title (en)

Turbo-molecular pump

Title (de)

Turbomolekularpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe turbo-moléculaire

Publication

EP 1030062 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00103326 A

Priority

  • JP 4103999 A
  • JP 15621599 A
  • JP 20099099 A
  • US 47313799 A

Abstract (en)

A turbo-molecular pump of high safety and reliability was presented, so that if an abnormal condition should develop on the rotor side, it will not lead to damage to the stationary portions such as the stator or pump casing to cause loss of vacuum in a vacuum processing system. The turbo-molecular pump comprises: a rotor; a stator assembly surrounding the rotor; and a casing portion surrounding the stator assembly, wherein at least a partial clearance is formed between the stator assembly and the casing portion, so that, when an abnormal torque is applied from the rotor to the stator assembly, direct impact transmission is prevented from the stator assembly to the casing portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04; F04D 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/00 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04D 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/042 (2013.01); F04D 27/008 (2013.01); F04D 29/522 (2013.01); F04D 29/701 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030062 A2 20000823; EP 1030062 A3 20020320; EP 1030062 B1 20071212; DE 60037353 D1 20080124; KR 100724048 B1 20070604; KR 20000058091 A 20000925

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080915

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080926

2008-09-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2008-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60037353

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-01-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-12-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI