Global patent index - EP 1030063 A3

EP 1030063 A3 2000-10-04 - Drain Pump

Title (en)

Drain Pump

Title (de)

Entleerungspumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe de vidange

Publication

EP 1030063 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99125699 A

Priority

JP 4114699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1030063A2] A drain pump 10 comprises a housing 20 of a pump body, and a rotary vane 30 placed inside the housing 20. A penetrating hole 24 is formed to the center of a lid 22 mounted to the upper portion of the housing 20, and a shaft 32 of the rotary vane 30 penetrates through the hole 24 and protrudes to the upper portion of the lid 22. A rotor 54 is equipped inside a bracket 52 of a motor 50, which rotates a driving shaft 60 of the motor. The driving shaft 60 is supported through bearings 70 and 80 to the motor bracket 52. The driving shaft 60 of the motor protrudes from the motor bracket 52, and is press-fitted to the hole 34 with a bottom formed to the shaft 32 of the rotary vane 30, so as to drive the rotary vane 30. The collar 100 comprises a cylindrical portion 105 and a disk-shaped flange 110, wherein the flange 110 positioned above the penetrating hole 24 prevents a deflector disk from moving upwards. The flange 110 also prevents the drain water leaking out from the hole 24 of the lid 22 from splashing on the motor. A lubricant oil collect area is formed between the upper surface 120 of the cylindrical portion 105 and the bearing 80. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/08 (2006.01); F04D 1/14 (2006.01); F04D 11/00 (2006.01); F04D 13/06 (2006.01); F04D 29/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/06 (2013.01); F04D 29/106 (2013.01); F05B 2240/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030063 A2 20000823; EP 1030063 A3 20001004; EP 1030063 B1 20020306; CN 1120938 C 20030910; CN 1263996 A 20000823; DE 69900973 D1 20020411; DE 69900973 T2 20021121; ES 2173699 T3 20021016; JP 2000240581 A 20000905; JP 4294143 B2 20090708; KR 20000057773 A 20000925; TW 445349 B 20010711

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051224

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-01-25 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-12-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2004-12-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041223

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173699

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69900973

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-11

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI