Global patent index - EP 1030065 A1

EP 1030065 A1 2000-08-23 - Fluid power cylinder with fluid locking

Title (en)

Fluid power cylinder with fluid locking

Title (de)

Druckmittelbetriebener Arbeitszylinder mit fluidischer Wegsperrung

Title (fr)

Vérin avec verrouillage fluidique

Publication

EP 1030065 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100096 A

Priority

DE 29902773 U

Abstract (en)

The cylinder consists of a double-wall cylinder tube (1) with flow grooves, a guide part (2), a bottom closing part (3) and a piston rod (6) with piston (7) between a piston cavity (31) and an annular piston cavity (32). The bottom closing part contains a control cylinder cavity (8) with a control piston (15) kept in the blocking middle position by springs (13, 14) on either side.The unpressurized fluid in the piston cavities blocks the movement of the piston and its rod. When pressure is applied, the system is unblocked.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt einen druckmittelbetriebenen Differentialarbeitszylinder mit fluidischer Wegsperrung, der bei Ausfall der Druckenergie den Abfluß des Fluids verhindert, keine aufwendigen mechanischen Sperreinrichtungen aufweist, keine externen Klemmvorrichtungen benötigt, wartungsfrei ist, eine kompakte Bauweise aufweist, eine hinreichend genaue Positionierung ermöglicht und in bewegten Systemen mit großen dynamischen Kräften einsetzbar sowie kostengünstig herstellbar ist. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, daß ein aus einem doppelwandigen Zylinderrohr (1) mit Strömungsnuten, einem Führungsteil (2), einem Bodenverschlußteil (3) sowie einer Kolbenstange (6) mit einem, zwischen einem Kolbenraum (31) und einem Ringkolbenraum (32) angeordneten Kolben (7), bestehender Arbeitszylinder, vorzugsweise im Bodenverschlußteil (3) ein integriertes Wegsperrsystem aufweist, das im Wesentlichen aus einem Steuerzylinderraum (8) mit einem Steuerkolben (15) besteht, der mittels einer linken Feder (13) und einer rechten Feder (14) in sperrender Mittelstellung gehalten wird und im drucklosen Zustand das Fluid im Kolbenraum (31) und Ringkolbenraum (32) eingeschlossen hält, somit die Bewegung der Kolbenstange (6) mit dem Kolben (7) sperrt und das Wegsperrsytem bei Druckbeaufschlagung entsperrt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/01; F15B 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/26 (2006.01); F15B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/26 (2013.01); F15B 20/004 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902773 U1 19990512; AT 277289 T 20041015; EP 1030065 A1 20000823; EP 1030065 B1 20040922

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50007829

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110107

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110107

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100107

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090107

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-07-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007829

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030606

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

2000-10-06 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2000-09-27 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI