Global Patent Index - EP 1030098 A2

EP 1030098 A2 2000-08-23 - Injection method and apparatus for odorising a gas, in a pumping station

Title (en)

Injection method and apparatus for odorising a gas, in a pumping station

Title (de)

Einspritzverfahren und Vorrichtung zur Odorierung von Gas in einer Pumpstation

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil d'injection destiné à conférer une odeur à un gaz dans un station de pompage

Publication

EP 1030098 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830684 A

Priority

IT BO990071 A

Abstract (en)

A method for odorising a gas in a pumping station (1) provided with an intake pipeline (2) for drawing the gas from a distribution line, with a meter (3) and with a pipeline (4) for delivering the gas towards a user, arranged in mutual succession - comprises a phase whereby an odorising liquid is dispersed into the gas transiting through the pipeline (4) for delivering the gas implemented by a controlled injector (10) of odorising liquid and further cyclical phases consisting of supplying the injector (10) with odorising liquid contained in a pressurisable tank (5) of pre-determined volume by means of thrust imparted on the odorising liquid by a flow (6) of gas drawn from the intake pipeline (2) and introduced into the pressurisable tank (5); of re-injecting the flow (6) of gas back into the intake pipeline (2), upstream of the meter (3); and of refilling the pressurisable tank (5) of the odorising liquid with a volume of liquid corresponding to the transferred volume. An injection apparatus (B) operating according to the method is an integral part of the invention. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17D 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030098 A2 20000823; EP 1030098 A3 20011212; EP 1030098 B1 20030402; DE 69906472 D1 20030508; DE 69906472 T2 20040226; IT 1309004 B1 20020115; IT BO990071 A1 20000821; IT BO990071 D0 19990219

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101029

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101029

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69906472

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906472 P 20030508

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI