Global Patent Index - EP 1030099 A2

EP 1030099 A2 2000-08-23 - Lighting device

Title (en)

Lighting device

Title (de)

Beleuchtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' éclairage

Publication

EP 1030099 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99122940 A

Priority

IT MI990315 A

Abstract (en)

A lighting device (1) comprises a shell (2) enclosing a reflecting body (5) comprising a plurality of hollow, paraboloid-shaped housings (6), each able to accommodate, in a position substantially close to the focus of the paraboloid, a light source (4) such as a LED, for example, supported on a plate (3), the shell (2) being covered by a light-transparent cover (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/0083 (2013.01); F21W 2111/02 (2013.01); F21Y 2105/10 (2016.08); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030099 A2 20000823; EP 1030099 A3 20011128; CA 2298812 A1 20000817; IT 1308709 B1 20020110; IT MI990315 A1 20000817

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI