Global patent index - EP 1030103 A2

EP 1030103 A2 2000-08-23 - Lamp

Title (en)

Lamp

Title (de)

Leuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe

Publication

EP 1030103 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101994 A

Priority

DE 29902973 U

Abstract (en)

The spot lamp has a conical lamp body (1) provided with a light source (9) and a reflector (6), for providing a directional spot lamp beam, with a linear drive for displacement of the light source relative to the reflector. The linear displacement is controlled by rotation of a rotary setting screw (16) incorporated in the lamp body engaging a rack for converting the screw rotation into a linear displacement.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Leuchte mit einem Leuchtenkörper (1), der ein Leuchtmittel (9), andere zum Betrieb der Leuchte notwendige Betriebsmittel (2) und einen Reflektor (6) zum Abstrahlen des durch den Leuchtenkörper erzeugten Lichts aufnimmt. Das Leuchtmittel (9) ist entlang der Längsachse des Leuchtenkörpers (1) verschieblich in dem Leuchtenkörper im Verhältnis zu dem Reflektor (6) angeordnet. Das Verschieben wird mittels eines Linearbetriebs bewerkstelligt, um eine Drehbewegung eines Drehelements in eine translatorische Bewegung des Leuchtmittels (9) umzusetzen. Es ist Aufgabe der Erfindung, den Aufbau des Lineargetriebes zu vereinfachen. Dieses wird erfindungsgemäß dadurch gelöst, dass das Drehelement eine in dem Leuchtenkörper (1) gelagerte Verstellschraube (16) aufweist, die ein in einem Schlitten (3) vorgesehenes Gewinde kämmt, so dass der Schlitten (3) mit dem darin angeordneten Leuchtmittel (9) die translatorische Bewegung ausführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902973 U1 19990512; EP 1030103 A2 20000823; EP 1030103 A3 20011017

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI