Global patent index - EP 1030109 A1

EP 1030109 A1 2000-08-23 - Fuel injector for injecting liquid and/or gas fuels in a combustion chamber

Title (en)

Fuel injector for injecting liquid and/or gas fuels in a combustion chamber

Title (de)

Brennstofflanze zum Eindüsen von flüssigen und/oder gasförmigen Brennstoffen in eine Brennkammer

Title (fr)

Injecteur de combustible pour l'injection de combustibles liquides et/ou gazeux dans une chambre de combustion

Publication

EP 1030109 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810118 A

Priority

DE 19905996 A

Abstract (en)

Liquid and/or gas-form fuel is injected into a combustion chamber by a fuel lance (10), involving a first guide tube (23) for the radial injection of fuel out of a liquid fuel channel (17) into the combustion chamber. The guide tube runs outwards through a gas channel (15) and an air channel (13). A second guide tube (21) runs outwards in a radial direction from the gas channel through the air channel. The second guide tube concentrically encloses the first guide tube spaced from it. Both guide tubes issue in the area of a lance cover (12) aperture (22) so that the liquid fuel emerging from the first guide tube forms a plain jet and the fuel jets from both tubes are surrounded cover-wise by air flowing from the air channel.

Abstract (de)

Brennstofflanze (10) zum Eindüsen von flüssigen und/oder gasförmigen Brennstoffen in eine Brennkammer, welche mit ersten Mittel zum radialen Eindüsen des Flüssigbrennstoffes aus einem Flüssigbrennstoffkanal (17) in die Brennkammer versehen ist. Die ersten Mittel umfassen ein erstes Leitrohr (23), das in radialer Richtung vom Flüssigbrennstoffkanal (17) ausgehend durch einen Gaskanal (15) und einen Luftkanal (13) nach aussen verläuft. Zudem sind zweite Mittel vorgesehen, welche ein zweites Leitrohr (21) umfassen, das in radialer Richtung vom Gaskanal (15) ausgehend durch den Luftkanal (13) nach aussen verläuft und das erste Leitrohr (23) in einem Abstand konzentrisch umgibt. Beide Leitrohre (21, 23) münden im Bereich einer Mantelöffnung (22) im Lanzenmantel (12) derart, dass der aus dem ersten Leitrohr (23) austretende Flüssigbrennstoffstrahl als Plain-Jet in die Brennkammer austritt und die aus den Leitrohren (21, 23) austretenden Brennstoffstrahlen von der aus dem Luftkanal (13) durch die Mantelöffnung (22) ausströmende Luft mantelförmig umgeben werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 17/00; F23D 11/10; F23D 14/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/30 (2006.01); F23D 11/10 (2006.01); F23D 14/22 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 17/002 (2013.01); F23D 11/101 (2013.01); F23D 14/22 (2013.01); F23D 2214/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19905996 A1 20000817; CN 1175202 C 20041110; CN 1265455 A 20000906; EP 1030109 A1 20000823; EP 1030109 B1 20040407; JP 2000234735 A 20000829; JP 4465076 B2 20100519; US 6325618 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50005950

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50005950

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005950

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI