Global Patent Index - EP 1030117 A2

EP 1030117 A2 2000-08-23 - Gas hob with sunken burners

Title (en)

Gas hob with sunken burners

Title (de)

Gaskochmulde mit tiefgelegt angeordneten Gasbrennern

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson avec brûleurs abaissés

Publication

EP 1030117 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101691 A

Priority

DE 19907113 A

Abstract (en)

The hob has gas burners and a saucepan support. Dividing walls (9) projecting into the level of the gas flames are positioned between the burner points (3). The dividing walls are integral parts of a saucepan support (7).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Gaskochmulde mit tiefgelegt innerhalb einer wannenförmig ausgestalteten Aufnahmeschale angeordneten Gasbrennern sind im Bereich zwischen den Brennerstellen in die Ebene der Gasflammen reichende Trennwandungen angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/12; F24C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030117 A2 20000823; EP 1030117 A3 20020130; EP 1030117 B1 20040512; DE 19907113 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50006365

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-08-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006365 P 20040617

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24C 15/10 A, 7F 24C 3/08 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI