Global Patent Index - EP 1030134 A2

EP 1030134 A2 2000-08-23 - Evaporator plate

Title (en)

Evaporator plate

Title (de)

Verdampferplatine

Title (fr)

Plaque d'évaporateur

Publication

EP 1030134 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101901 A

Priority

DE 19907183 A

Abstract (en)

The evaporator panel (30) has at least one coolant channel mounted on it with at least one end section connected to a vacuum line and at least one end section on the input side supplied with coolant via a capillary tube acting as a choke and with a coolant injection point (42) formed by the capillary tube. There is an arrangement (33,39) for coupling the injection point to the panel with at least substantial noise damping

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Verdampferplatine (10,30) mit wenigstens einem darauf angeordneten Kältemittelkanal (11,31), welcher wenigstens einen zuflußseitigen, über ein Drosselrohr (14,40) mit Kältemittel beaufschlagbaren Kanalendabschnitt (19,32) und einen an eine Saugleitung angeschlossenen abflußseitigen Kanalendabschnitt (12,36) aufweist, ist der zuflußseitige Kanalendabschnitt (19,32) mit einem dazu vorgelagerten, rohrähnlichen Anschlußstück (20,33) verbunden, welches zum Anschluß des Drosselrohres (14,40) dient und welches zumindest weitestgehend körperschallhemmend an die Verdampferplatine (10,30), zwischen dessen zuflußseitigem Kanalendabschnitt (19,32) und dessen abflußseitigem Kanalendabschnitt (12,36) angekoppelt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 39/02; F25B 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/02 (2006.01); F25B 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/024 (2013.01); F25B 41/067 (2013.01); F25B 2400/052 (2013.01); F25B 2400/054 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030134 A2 20000823; EP 1030134 A3 20020710; EP 1030134 B1 20060816; DE 19907183 A1 20000824; DE 50013313 D1 20060928; ES 2269030 T3 20070401

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50013313

- Effective date: 20150402

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2014-03-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140321

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-10-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20130904

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-10-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120201

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070518

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269030 T3

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013313 P 20060928

2006-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060904

2006-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2006-08-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050309

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-04-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030110

- Countries: SI

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUEBNER, HEINZ

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARNOLD, FRIEDRICH

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOWE, MICHAEL

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI