Global patent index - EP 1030137 A1

EP 1030137 A1 2000-08-23 - Controller and method for controlling a defrost operation in a refrigerator

Title (en)

Controller and method for controlling a defrost operation in a refrigerator

Title (de)

Steuervorrichtung und Verfahren zum Steuern des Abtauvorganges in einem Kühlschrank

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande et procédé pour commander l'opération de dégivrage dans un réfrigérateur

Publication

EP 1030137 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99102741 A

Priority

EP 99102741 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a controller and a method of controlling a defrost operation in a refrigerator. The duration of a refrigeration period is determined by the amount of time needed for defrosting the evaporator of the refrigerator. If the defrost duration deviates from a target defrost duration, the next refrigeration period is adjusted accordingly, to maintain the actual defrost duration close to the target defrost duration. According to the invention, the target defrost duration is determined based on the detection of a thermal dispersion of the refrigerator. A high ambient temperature results in a reduced target defrost duration while in low ambient temperature conditions the target defrost duration is larger. Preferably, the thermal dispersion is detected based on the ratio of a rate of fall of evaporator temperature when the compressor is on to a rate of rise of evaporator temperature when the compressor is off, on a continuous basis during the refrigeration period. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 21/00 (2006.01); F25D 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 21/008 (2013.01); F25B 2500/29 (2013.01); F25B 2500/31 (2013.01); F25B 2700/2117 (2013.01); F25D 2500/04 (2013.01); F25D 2700/02 (2013.01); F25D 2700/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2945691 A1 19800619 - AMF INC

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030137 A1 20000823; EP 1030137 B1 20050202; AU 3424200 A 20000904; DE 69923531 D1 20050310; DE 69923531 T2 20060330; EP 1157245 A1 20011128; ES 2236975 T3 20050716; WO 0049350 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100220

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100219

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100219

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100219

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090106

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2236975

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-04-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050423

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69923531

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT

2005-02-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-11-17 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: DEDKESGBIT

- Effective date: 20040607

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030711

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI