Global Patent Index - EP 1030141 A2

EP 1030141 A2 2000-08-23 - Refrigerator with dispenser for cans or bottles of drinks or beverages in general

Title (en)

Refrigerator with dispenser for cans or bottles of drinks or beverages in general

Title (de)

Kühlschrank mit Abgabevorrichtung für Dosen oder Flaschen oder Getränke im allgemeinen

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur avec distributeur pour boîtes ou bouteilles contenant des boissons en général

Publication

EP 1030141 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102330 A

Priority

IT MI990098 U

Abstract (en)

A refrigerator (1) comprises a cabinet (2) in which at least one preservation compartment (4) is provided, and a door (3) hinged to said cabinet (2) and arranged to close said compartment (4), said door (3) comprising a door liner (5) arranged to face said compartment (4) and further comprising at least one tray (8) for supporting food and a plurality of support elements (10) for said tray (8) which enable it to be positioned at different heights on said door liner (5). In this latter there is positioned a member (11) acting as a dispenser for drink or beverage containers (12) which is open at opposing ends (at 13A and 34) and is arranged to contain drink cans or bottles (12), said member (11) lowerly comprising a shelf (33) for supporting one of said containers (12) in such a manner as to enable it to be gripped by a user.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/04; A47B 57/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 1/04 (2006.01); F25D 23/04 (2006.01); F25D 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/04 (2013.01); A47F 1/04 (2013.01); F25D 25/00 (2013.01); F25D 2331/803 (2013.01); F25D 2331/805 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030141 A2 20000823; EP 1030141 A3 20020612; EP 1030141 B1 20051005; DE 60022926 D1 20060216; DE 60022926 T2 20060629; ES 2246758 T3 20060301; IT 246537 Y1 20020409; IT MI990098 U1 20000821; IT MI990098 V0 19990219

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160203

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-09-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2246758 T3

2006-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60022926 P 20060216

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-10-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI