Global Patent Index - EP 1030142 A2

EP 1030142 A2 2000-08-23 - Refrigeration aparatus

Title (en)

Refrigeration aparatus

Title (de)

Kältegerät

Title (fr)

Appareil frigorifique

Publication

EP 1030142 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101899 A

Priority

DE 19907093 A

Abstract (en)

The refrigerator has a thermally insulating housing accommodating at least one cold chamber and at least one door, whereby the door and housing have an outer cladding and a separate inner cladding on which bearer elements for mounting refrigerator equipment, e.g. storage containers, shelves, evaporators or similar, are mounted. The bearer elements are made of at least one base body (16) for attachment to the inner cladding (13) and at least one auxiliary body (18) mounted on it.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Kältegerät (10) mit einem wenigstens einem Kälteraum (14) aufnehmenden wärmeisolierenden Gehäuse (11) und wenigstens einer Tür, wobei die Tür und das Gehäuse (11) eine Außenverkleidung (12) und eine dazu beabstandete Innenverkleidung (13) aufweisen, an welcher Tragteile zur Halterung von Bauteilen wie Ablagefächer, Zwischenböden (22), Verdampfer oder dergleichen vorgesehen sind, sind die Tragelemente aus wenigstens einem an der Innenverkleidung (13) festsetzbaren Grundkörper (16) und wenigstens einem daran angeordneten Zusatzkörper (18) gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/06; A47B 96/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/067 (2013.01); F25D 2400/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030142 A2 20000823; EP 1030142 A3 20020109; EP 1030142 B1 20071212; DE 19907093 A1 20000824; DE 50014832 D1 20080124; ES 2296576 T3 20080501

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2014-03-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140321

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014832

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120131

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080915

2008-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2296576 T3

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080312

2008-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014832 P 20080124

2007-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT SE

2007-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT SE

2002-09-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20020709

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT SE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI