Global patent index - EP 1030144 A2

EP 1030144 A2 2000-08-23 - Wall with supporting elements

Title (en)

Wall with supporting elements

Title (de)

Wand mit Halteelementen

Title (fr)

Paroi avec éléments de soutien

Publication

EP 1030144 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101898 A

Priority

DE 19907186 A

Abstract (en)

The holder element has an outer cladding, a thermally insulating intermediate layer and an inner cladding on which holding elements are mounted for storage containers, shelves or similar. The holding element (33) is movable in a holder (17) between two holding positions fixed by latching elements (31,44); in a first holding position the holding element is at least substantially accommodated by the holder and in the second it protrudes from the holding region (19).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer wärmeisolierenden Wand wie einer Kühlschranktür (10), einem Kühlschrankgehäuse oder dergleichen, mit einer Außenverkleidung (11), einer wärmeisolierenden Zwischenschicht (12) und einer Innenverkleidung (13) an welcher Halteelemente (33) zur Halterung von Ablagefächern, Zwischenböden oder dergleichen angeordnet sind, sind die Halteelemente (33) innerhalb einer Aufnahme (17) zumindest zwischen zwei durch Rastmittel (21,35;31,44) festgelegte Positionen verschieblich geführt, wobei in einer ersten Position die Halteelemente (33) zumindest weitestgehend von der Aufnahme (17) aufgenommen sind, während sie in ihrer zweiten Position aus dem Aufnahmebereich (19) der Aufnahme ragen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 25/02; A47B 96/07; F25D 23/04; F25D 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/06 (2006.01); F25D 23/06 (2006.01); F25D 23/04 (2006.01); F25D 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/061 (2013.01); F25D 23/067 (2013.01); F25D 23/04 (2013.01); F25D 25/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030144 A2 20000823; EP 1030144 A3 20020109; EP 1030144 B1 20041020; DE 19907186 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140131

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-10-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20100902

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-02-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008280

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-11-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: SI

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: WALL WITH SUPPORTING ELEMENTS

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20020709

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI