Global Patent Index - EP 1030145 A2

EP 1030145 A2 2000-08-23 - Refrigerating apparatus

Title (en)

Refrigerating apparatus

Title (de)

Kühlgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil frigorifique

Publication

EP 1030145 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101900 A

Priority

DE 29903025 U

Abstract (en)

The refrigeration appliance has a thermally insulating housing enclosing the refrigeration space which is fitted with at least one shelf for storage of the refrigerated goods, provided with a wave shaped holder for holding bottles The holder has a guide section cooperating with a guide extending along at least one side edge of the shelf, for sliding movement of the holder.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Kühlgerät (10) mit einem wärmeisolierenden Gehäuse (11), innerhalb welchem wenigstens ein Kühlraum (12) angeordnet ist, welcher mit wenigstens einem zur Ablage von Kühlgut dienenden Zwischenboden (17) ausgestattet ist, an welchem eine wellenprofilartige Halteeinrichtung (21) zur weitestgehend liegenden Lagerung von flaschenartigem Lagergut angeordnet ist, ist die wellenprofilartige Halteeinrichtung (21) mit einem Führungsabschnitt versehen, mit welchem es zumindest an einem an einer Seitenkante des Zwischenbodens (17) vorgesehenen Führung stegverschieblich geführt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 25/02; A47B 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/02 (2006.01); F25D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/02 (2013.01); F25D 31/007 (2013.01); F25D 2325/022 (2013.01); F25D 2331/803 (2013.01); F25D 2331/809 (2013.01); F25D 2400/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19631372 A1 19980205 - BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903025 U1 19990422; EP 1030145 A2 20000823; EP 1030145 A3 20010418; EP 1030145 B1 20050105; ES 2235691 T3 20050716

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-30 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH; DE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-10-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235691 T3

2005-04-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009147 P 20050210

2005-01-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030925

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20011018

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI