Global Patent Index - EP 1030146 A3

EP 1030146 A3 2001-02-07 - Refrigerating apparatus

Title (en)

Refrigerating apparatus

Title (de)

Kühlgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil frigorifique

Publication

EP 1030146 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101980 A

Priority

DE 19907050 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1030146A2] The refrigerator has at least one cold chamber (12) inside a thermally insulating housing, able to be closed with a door and in which intermediate shelves are fitted to enable goods to be accommodated. At least one shelf is movably mounted in guides on the side walls (14) to slide like a drawer. The guides are in the form of lateral bearer arms of a U-shaped bearer frame (18) removably attached to the side walls of the cold chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 25/02; A47B 88/08; A47B 96/02; A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01); F25D 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/024 (2013.01); A47B 88/43 (2017.01); A47B 2210/01 (2013.01); F25D 2325/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030146 A2 20000823; EP 1030146 A3 20010207; DE 19907050 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030909

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030226

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010807

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 25D 25/02 A, 7A 47B 88/08 B, 7A 47B 96/02 B, 7A 47B 88/04 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI