Global Patent Index - EP 1030149 A1

EP 1030149 A1 2000-08-23 - Combined blowing and suction device with integral energy exchange for a drying apparatus

Title (en)

Combined blowing and suction device with integral energy exchange for a drying apparatus

Title (de)

Kombinierte Blas- und Saugluftanordnung mit integriertem Energieaustausch für eine Trocknungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif combiné de soufflage et d'aspiration à échange énergétique intégré pour un dispositif de séchage

Publication

EP 1030149 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400438 A

Priority

FR 9902020 A

Abstract (en)

The paper web drier has a blower compartment (1) adjacent to two suction compartments (4) on either side. The suction compartments are separated by two walls (6,11) which allow heat exchange between the air flow in the blower compartment and the flows in the suction compartments. The wall surfaces can be textured for improved heat exchange.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif de séchage pour des bandes continues de papier met en jeu des flux d'air de soufflage et d'aspiration. La température du flux d'aspiration est supérieure à la température du flux de soufflage. Le dispositif comprend des moyens (6) pour réaliser un échange énergétique entre les flux de soufflage et d'aspiration. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/10 (2006.01); F26B 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/104 (2013.01); F26B 13/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030149 A1 20000823; FR 2790072 A1 20000825; FR 2790072 B1 20010525; US 6289603 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001118

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI