Global patent index - EP 1030216 A3

EP 1030216 A3 2000-12-06 - Internal latent image-type direct positive silver halide emulsion and color diffusion transfer light-sensitive material using the same

Title (en)

Internal latent image-type direct positive silver halide emulsion and color diffusion transfer light-sensitive material using the same

Title (de)

Direkt-positive Innenlatentbild-Silberhalogenidemulsion und lichtempfindliches Farbdiffusionsübertragungsmaterial, das diese Emulsion enthält

Title (fr)

Emulsion positive directe à l'halogénure d'argent du type à image latente interne et matériau sensible à la lumière pour transfert par diffusion de colorants contenant cette émulsion

Publication

EP 1030216 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00102272 A

Priority

  • JP 4023199 A
  • JP 20217699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1030216A2] Disclosed is an internal latent image-type direct positive silver halide photographic emulsion having a core/shell structure comprising a chemically sensitized core and a chemically sensitized shell, wherein a compound having an adsorbing group to silver halide and a reducing group, or a precursor thereof is contained together with a gold sensitizer and a compound having C=X bond, P=X bond or R-XO2X bond (wherein X represents sulfur, selenium or tellurium and R represents an aliphatic hydrocarbon group, an aryl group or a heterocyclic group) at the chemical sensitization of the core and/or shell. A color diffusion transfer light-sensitive material using the emulsion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/485; G03C 8/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/09 (2006.01); G03C 1/485 (2006.01); G03C 8/08 (2006.01); G03C 8/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 8/08 (2013.01); G03C 1/48576 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

G03C 1/48576 + G03C 1/08 + G03C 2001/091 + G03C 1/0051

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030216 A2 20000823; EP 1030216 A3 20001206; JP 2000305234 A 20001102

INPADOC legal status

2007-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070123

2007-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJIFILM CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031107

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 03C 1/485 A, 7G 03C 8/08 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI