Global Patent Index - EP 1030229 A2

EP 1030229 A2 2000-08-23 - Method and device for developing images using a magnetic brush

Title (en)

Method and device for developing images using a magnetic brush

Title (de)

Verfahren und Gerät zur Bildentwicklung mit einer Magnetbürste

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif utilisant le développement d'images par brosse magnétique

Publication

EP 1030229 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102273 A

Priority

  • JP 3919899 A
  • JP 15537899 A
  • JP 2000029637 A

Abstract (en)

In an image forming apparatus, the rise and fall of a short magnet brush are realized and allow a nip for development to be reduced. This, coupled with the fact that the short magnet brush uniformly rises and falls in the axial direction of a developing sleeve, frees the trailing edge of an image from local omission or jaggedness while reducing defective images including a thinned dot image. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0921 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0609 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030229 A2 20000823; EP 1030229 A3 20030521; EP 1030229 B1 20061011; DE 60031189 D1 20061123; DE 60031189 T2 20070823; EP 1452928 A2 20040901; EP 1452928 A3 20041006; EP 1452929 A2 20040901; EP 1452929 A3 20041006; ES 2270755 T3 20070416; US 6385423 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2270755 T3

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031189 P 20061123

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-04-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DEVELOPING IMAGES USING A MAGNETIC BRUSH

2004-02-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RICOH COMPANY LTD.

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI