Global Patent Index - EP 1030278 A1

EP 1030278 A1 2000-08-23 - Protective enclosure for optical apparatuses, especially video-cameras

Title (en)

Protective enclosure for optical apparatuses, especially video-cameras

Title (de)

Schutzgehäuse für optische Geräte, insbesondere für Video-Kameras

Title (fr)

Enceinte de protecton pour appareils optiques, spécialement les caméras video

Publication

EP 1030278 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100794 A

Priority

DE 19906692 A

Abstract (en)

The housing (1) has a tubular housing casing (4) with a window wall (5) at one end, a rear wall (6) at the other end and an equipment carrier (8) inside for the optical device (2) that enables displacement of the device along a housing axis. The carrier encloses the optical device over at least part of its circumference, is supported on the housing casing transversely wrt. the housing axis is force-locked wrt. the housing casing. and can be displaced along the housing axis.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schutzgehäuse (1) für optische Geräte (2), insbesondere für Video--Kameras, besitzt einen rohrförmigen Gehäusemantel (4), am einen Ende eine Fensterwand (5), am anderen Ende eine Rückwand (6) und im Gehäuseinnern (7) einen Geräteträger (8) für das optische Gerät (2), wobei der Geräteträger (8) eine Verlagerung des optischen Geräts (2) in Richtung einer Gehäuseachse (A-A) ermöglicht. Zur Verringerung der Herstellkosten und zur Ermöglichung kleinerer Abmessungen ist der Geräteträger (8) so ausgebildet, daß er das optische Gerät (2) einschließt, sich quer zur Gehäuseachse (A-A) am Gehäusemantel (4) abstützt, gegenüber dem Gehäusemantel (4) kraftschlüssig festgehalten und in Richtung der Gehäuseachse (A-A) verschiebbar ist. Vorzugsweise ist zur kraftschlüssigen Festlegung des Geräteträgers (8, 23) mindestens ein elastischer Klemmkörper zwischen Gehäusemantel (4) und Geräteträger (8) angeordnet, der ggf. durch eine Klemmvorrichtung gegen den Gehäusemantel (4) verspannbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/196 (2006.01); G08B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19632 (2013.01); G08B 13/19619 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030278 A1 20000823; DE 19906692 C1 20001228

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030507

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIDEOR TECHNICAL E. HARTIG GMBH

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI