Global patent index - EP 1030290 A2

EP 1030290 A2 2000-08-23 - Method for hidden transferring and/or storing of additional information within a signal, particularly an audio signal

Title (en)

Method for hidden transferring and/or storing of additional information within a signal, particularly an audio signal

Title (de)

Verfahren zum unbemerkten übertragen und/oder Speichern von Zusatzinformationen innerhalb eines Signals, insbesondere Audiosignals

Title (fr)

Procédé de transfert et/ou de mémorisation d'informations additionelles cachées dans un signal, en particulier en signal audio

Publication

EP 1030290 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103108 A

Priority

  • DE 19906513 A
  • DE 19906512 A

Abstract (en)

The method for transmission and/or storage of auxiliary information signals within digital audio signal uses transformation of each signal block of the latter signal into partial bands or spectral components using data reduction parameters provided by a psychoacoustic model, with insertion of the auxiliary information signals in at least one partial band or spectral component. An Independent claim for aplication of the auxiliary information signal transmission and/or recording method for coding and decoding of signals is also included.

Abstract (de)

Um bei der Übertragung und/oder Speicherung digitalisierter Signale, insbesondere Audiosignale Zusatzinformationen übertragen und/oder speichern zu können, wird das Signal blockweise in Teilbänder oder Spektralkomponenten transformiert, mit Hilfe einer Berechnungsvorschrift, insbesondere eines psychoakustischen Modells für jeden der Blöcke eine Menge von Parametern zur Datenreduktion bestimmt, das Signal aufgrund dieser Parameter durch Quantisierung der in einer bestimmten Auflösung gegebenen Teilband- oder Spektralwerte datenreduziert und codiert, der Code decodiert und rückquantisiert, in mindestens ein Teilband oder eine Menge von Spektralkomponenten die Zusatzinformation an Stellen eingefügt, die durch die Datenreduktion in eine gröbere Darstellung übergegangen sind, und aus den Teilbändern oder Spektralkomponenten durch Rücktransformation ein zeitliches Signal wiedergewonnen. Dabei wird das ursprüngliche Datenformat beibehalten. Das Verfahren arbeitet auf Audiosignalen, die auf herkömmlichen digitalen Medien (CD, DAT, Rechner) anfallen. Die unter Berücksichtigung psychoakustischer Merkmale eingebetteten Zusatzinformationen sind im Audiosignal verborgen und können unter Verwendung eines entsprechenden Coders bzw. Decoders wiedergewonnen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/02 (2006.01); G10L 19/00 (2006.01); G10L 19/018 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/0208 (2013.01); G10L 19/018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030290 A2 20000823; EP 1030290 A3 20021211

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-10-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10L 19/02 A, 7G 10L 19/14 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI