Global Patent Index - EP 1030315 A2

EP 1030315 A2 2000-08-23 - Data cable and manufacturing method of a data cable

Title (en)

Data cable and manufacturing method of a data cable

Title (de)

Datenkabel und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Datenkabels

Title (fr)

Câble de données et méthode de fabrication d'un câble de données

Publication

EP 1030315 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103629 A

Priority

DE 19907036 A

Abstract (en)

The data cable has an outer sheathing (4) enclosing at least 2 twisted cable strands (2), each provided with at least 2 twisted cable conductors (1). The cable strands are held at a relative spacing by a plastically deformable central element (3), with a diameter which varies along the cable longitudinal axis and/or which is provided with radial projections having a width which varies along the cable longitudinal axis. An Independent claim for a manufacturing method for a data cable is also included.

Abstract (de)

Ein Datenkabel mit verseilten Kabelsträngen (2), die voneinander beabstandet gehalten werden, weist wenigstens ein plastisch verformbares Zentralelement (3) auf, welches die Kabelstränge (2) voneinander beabstandet hält. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/18 (2006.01); H01B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030315 A2 20000823; EP 1030315 A3 20010502; DE 19907036 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI