Global Patent Index - EP 1030320 A1

EP 1030320 A1 2000-08-23 - Split geometry inductor

Title (en)

Split geometry inductor

Title (de)

Induktivität mit geteilter Geometrie

Title (fr)

Inductance à géométrie divisée

Publication

EP 1030320 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00301135 A

Priority

US 25110199 A

Abstract (en)

A miniaturized inductor of the thin-film type utilized in miniaturized electrical circuits is disclosed. The inductor includes two thin-film spiral inductive portions with a substrate positioned therebetween. The first inductive portion is wound in a clockwise direction and has a distal end. Conversely, the second inductive portion is wound in a counterclockwise direction and has a distal end connected to the distal end of the first inductive portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/0006 (2013.01); H01F 2017/0046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 4494100 A 19850115 - STENGEL ROBERT E [US], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 150 (E - 1189) 14 April 1992 (1992-04-14)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030320 A1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010224

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI