Global patent index - EP 1030329 A2

EP 1030329 A2 2000-08-23 - Switching element in particular switching pad or contacting edge

Title (en)

Switching element in particular switching pad or contacting edge

Title (de)

Schaltelement, insbesondere Schaltmatte oder Schaltleiste

Title (fr)

Elément de commutation, en particulier natte de commutation ou bordure à interrupteur

Publication

EP 1030329 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103630 A

Priority

DE 19906961 A

Abstract (en)

The switch element has a pair of electrically conductive plates (1.1,1.2) held at a relative spacing via a spacer element (3), provided in part by an insulator and in part by a contact element, used for providing an electrical connection between the conductive plates when a given pressure is exerted on one of the latter. The contact element for providing the electrical connection between the electrically conductive plates (1.1,1.2) is provided by a conductive elastomer spring element (4) which is deformed upon application of pressure.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Schaltelement, insbesondere Schaltmatte oder Schaltleiste aus zwei zueinander zumindest teilweise elektrisch leitfähigen Trägerelementen (1.1, 1.2), insbesondere Platten, welche über wenigstens einen Abstandhalter (3) zueinander beabstandet sind, soll der Abstandhalter (3) bei Beaufschlagung des zumindest einen Trägerelementes (1.1, 1.2) mit Druck als Kontaktelement eine elektrische Verbindung herstellt sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/141 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030329 A2 20000823; EP 1030329 A3 20030115; DE 19906961 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060307

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIRCHER REGLOMAT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI