Global patent index - EP 1030336 A2

EP 1030336 A2 2000-08-23 - Electric installation switchgear

Title (en)

Electric installation switchgear

Title (de)

Elektrisches Installationsschaltgerät

Title (fr)

Contacteur d'installation électrique

Publication

EP 1030336 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101252 A

Priority

  • DE 19906235 A
  • DE 19918577 A

Abstract (en)

The auxiliary switch (96) is fitted to one of the narrow side walls (84), where it clips into place. A link sliding at right angles to the side wall couples between the main contact(s) of the motor protection switch and the auxiliary switch.

Abstract (de)

Ein elektrisches Installationsschaltgerät, insbesondere ein Motorschutzschalter (80) oder dgl., ist mit einer T-Form ausgebildet; der Hilfsschalter (96) ist an die an die vordere Frontfläche (81) anschließende Schmalseitenfläche (84) angeschwenkt und daran verrastbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/545 (2013.01); H01H 2050/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030336 A2 20000823; EP 1030336 A3 20010509; EP 1030336 B1 20061227; DE 50013892 D1 20070208

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013892

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-02-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01H 50/54 A, 7H 01H 71/46 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI