Global Patent Index - EP 1030336 A3

EP 1030336 A3 2001-05-09 - Electric installation switchgear

Title (en)

Electric installation switchgear

Title (de)

Elektrisches Installationsschaltgerät

Title (fr)

Contacteur d'installation électrique

Publication

EP 1030336 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101252 A

Priority

  • DE 19906235 A
  • DE 19918577 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1030336A2] The auxiliary switch (96) is fitted to one of the narrow side walls (84), where it clips into place. A link sliding at right angles to the side wall couples between the main contact(s) of the motor protection switch and the auxiliary switch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/54; H01H 71/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/545 (2013.01); H01H 2050/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030336 A2 20000823; EP 1030336 A3 20010509; EP 1030336 B1 20061227; DE 50013892 D1 20070208

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013892

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160125

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013892 P 20070208

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 50/54 A, 7H 01H 71/46 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI