Global patent index - EP 1030339 A1

EP 1030339 A1 2000-08-23 - PHOSPHOR MATERIAL, PHOSPHOR MATERIAL POWDER, PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL, AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THESE

Title (en)

PHOSPHOR MATERIAL, PHOSPHOR MATERIAL POWDER, PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL, AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THESE

Title (de)

LUMINESZENZMITTEL, PULVERFÖRMIGES LUMINESZENZMITTEL, PLASMA-ANZEIGETAFEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DERSLEBEN

Title (fr)

SUBSTANCE LUMINOPHORE, POUDRE DE SUBSTANCE LUMINOPHORE, TELEVISION A ECRAN PLAT A PLASMA ET PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1030339 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98951690 A

Priority

  • JP 9804976 W
  • JP 30418497 A
  • JP 33535397 A
  • JP 34746597 A
  • JP 14098 A
  • JP 5172298 A
  • JP 13298398 A
  • JP 19300098 A

Abstract (en)

The plasma display panel of the present invention has, for achieving high luminance and high reliability, a plurality of discharge spaces formed between a front panel and a back panel that are disposed to oppose each other, and phosphor layers, formed in the discharge spaces, each including phosphor particles of one of blue, red and green colors, wherein the phosphor particles of at least one of blue, red and green colors included in the phosphor layer are flake-like particles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 11/02; C09K 11/59; C09K 11/64; C09K 11/78; C09K 11/80; H01J 1/62; H01J 9/227; H01J 17/49

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/77 (2006.01); C09K 11/78 (2006.01); C09K 11/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/7734 (2013.01); H01J 2211/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030339 A1 20000823; EP 1030339 A4 20010314; EP 1030339 B1 20040519; CN 1129946 C 20031203; CN 1247736 C 20060329; CN 1285081 A 20010221; CN 1475546 A 20040218; DE 69824034 D1 20040624; DE 69824034 T2 20050630; DE 69824053 D1 20040624; DE 69824053 T2 20050512; DE 69836837 D1 20070215; DE 69836837 T2 20071018; DE 69837500 D1 20070516; DE 69837500 T2 20071213; EP 1261013 A1 20021127; EP 1261013 B1 20040519; EP 1267383 A1 20021218; EP 1267383 B1 20070103; EP 1375626 A2 20040102; EP 1375626 A3 20040218; EP 1375626 B1 20070404; US 2003107318 A1 20030612; US 2003137234 A1 20030724; US 6614165 B1 20030902; US 6667574 B2 20031223; US 6833672 B2 20041221; WO 9924999 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071105

2006-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061102

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061101

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69824034

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020430

2001-03-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB