Global Patent Index - EP 1030341 A1

EP 1030341 A1 2000-08-23 - Radio frequency generator with very high power

Title (en)

Radio frequency generator with very high power

Title (de)

Hochfrequenzgenerator mit sehr hoher Leistung

Title (fr)

Générateur radiofréquence de très grande puissance

Publication

EP 1030341 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400406 A

Priority

FR 9901859 A

Abstract (en)

The radio frequency generator construction has an inductive output tube (K) having an electron gun (25) and anode (29). A radio frequency input (E) passes to the electron gun and the output (S) is produced from a chamber. The radio frequency input, the tube inductance (36) and the electron gun have an outer electro statically screened wall (37).

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention est relative a un générateur radiofréquence comportant : un tube à sortie inductive (K) avec un canon à électrons (25) suivi d'une anode (29), le canon étant destiné à être porté à une haute tension, des moyens (CE) pour produire un signal radiofréquence d'entrée (E) et des moyens (36) pour l'acheminer au tube à sortie inductive (K) de manière à ce qu'il fournisse un signal de sortie (S) amplifié en puissance par rapport au signal d'entrée (E). Les moyens (CE) pour produire le signal radiofréquence d'entrée, les moyens (36) pour l'acheminer au tube à sortie inductive et le canon sont confinés dans une enceinte (37) blindée électrostatiquement, isolée électriquement du potentiel de l'anode et destinée à être portée à la haute tension, le canon recevant la haute tension par l'enceinte blindée. Application : générateur radiofréquence de très grande puissance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 25/04; H01J 23/14; H01J 23/34; H01J 23/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 23/14 (2006.01); H01J 23/34 (2006.01); H01J 23/38 (2006.01); H01J 25/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 23/38 (2013.01); H01J 23/14 (2013.01); H01J 23/34 (2013.01); H01J 25/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5313138 A 19940517 - DESMUR HENRI [FR]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 125 (E - 1332) 16 March 1993 (1993-03-16)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 063 (E - 1500) 2 February 1994 (1994-02-02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030341 A1 20000823; CA 2298321 A1 20000816; FR 2789800 A1 20000818; FR 2789800 B1 20010511; US 6300715 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES ELECTRON DEVICES S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI