Global Patent Index - EP 1030346 A2

EP 1030346 A2 2000-08-23 - Modular ionisation detector

Title (en)

Modular ionisation detector

Title (de)

Modularer Ionisationsdetektor

Title (fr)

Détecteur à ionisation modulaire

Publication

EP 1030346 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99120952 A

Priority

DE 19907042 A

Abstract (en)

The ionisation detector has a body (150) provided by a number of stacked plates (15), with count volumes (10) defined between each 2 adjacent plates via aligned recesses in the plate surfaces, each count volume containing an electrode wire (5), with all electrode wires held at the same potential. The opposing surfaces of each stacked plate (15) are provided with a number of parallel semi-cylindrical recesses, for providing cylindrical count volumes (10) extending between the opposite end faces of the body (150) when the plates are stacked together.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung schafft einen modularen Ionisationsdetektor mit einem Körper (150), welcher aus einer Mehrzahl von übereinander gestapelten Platten (15) aufgebaut ist; wobei jeweils zwischen zwei benachbarten Platten (15) Zählvolumina (10) vorgesehen sind, durch die ein jeweiliger Elektrodendraht (5) gespannt ist; und wobei die Zählvolumina (10) durch in den jeweiligen Platten (15) vorgesehene Aussparungen gebildet sind, welche beim Stapeln der Platten (15) übereinander zu liegen kommen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 47/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 47/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030346 A2 20000823; EP 1030346 A3 20050119; DE 19907042 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160209

2009-04-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAPHYMO GMBH

2007-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071008

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-09-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-08-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENITRON INSTRUMENTS GMBH

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-10-25 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI