Global Patent Index - EP 1030421 A1

EP 1030421 A1 2000-08-23 - Fitting element for cable core

Title (en)

Fitting element for cable core

Title (de)

Kabelader-Anschlusselement

Title (fr)

Organe de contact pour âme de cable

Publication

EP 1030421 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125286 A

Priority

DE 19907319 A

Abstract (en)

The overvoltage protection element has a 3-pole overvoltage diverter with at least one fuse element (4), a fail-safe contact and a signal contact, the central electrode (18) of the overvoltage diverter permanently coupled to earth potential. The fuse element is spring biased against an insulating region (17) of the overvoltage diverter, with the signal contact permanently connected to the fail-safe contact, which has a second fuse element (20) associated with an earth contact (19). An Independent claim for a fail-safe contact for use in an overvoltage protection element is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Überspannungsschutzelement (1) mit direkter Signalisierung, umfassend einen dreipoligen Überspannungsableiter (2), einen Fail-Safe-Kontakt (3) und einen Signalisierungskontakt (5), wobei die Mittelelektrode (18) des Überspannungsableiter (2) permanent mit einem Erdpotential verbunden ist, der Fail-Safe-Kontakt (3) mit mindestens einem Schmelzelement (4)ausgebildet und federnd vorgespannt auf den Überspannungsableiter (2) aufsteckbar ist, wobei das Schmelzelement (4) auf isolierten Bereichen (17) des Überspannungsableiters (2) aufliegt, und der Signalisierungskontakt (5) permanent mit dem Fail-Safe-Kontakt (3) elektrisch verbunden ist, sowie einen Fail-Safe-Kontakt (3) zum Einsatz in einem Überspannungsschutzelement (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 1/14; H01T 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 1/12 (2006.01); H01T 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 1/14 (2013.01); H01T 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030421 A1 20000823; CN 1264942 A 20000830; CN 1306670 C 20070321; DE 19907319 A1 20000831; DE 19907319 B4 20050428

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020613

2002-06-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: OVERVOLTAGE PROTECTION DEVICE

2002-05-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: OVERVOLTAGE PROTECTION DEVICE

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI