Global patent index - EP 1030475 A2

EP 1030475 A2 2000-08-23 - Method for the transmission of digitally coded traffic information and receiver for implementing this method

Title (en)

Method for the transmission of digitally coded traffic information and receiver for implementing this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Übertragung von digital codierten Verkehrsnachrichten und Funkempfänger dazu

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la transmission d'informations routières codées numériques et récepteur pour mettre en oeuvre cette méthode

Publication

EP 1030475 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100560 A

Priority

DE 19905893 A

Abstract (en)

Coded traffic messages are transferred according to a standardized assembly/format, particularly in accordance with a TMC method. A header (12) is placed before the traffic messages coded in digital form (13) and that at least one further information (14-16) follows the traffic message coded in digital form (13), in which case one of this information contains a topography information (14). An Independent claim is included for: (a) a radio receiver

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Übertragung von digital codierten Verkehrsnachrichten vorgeschlagen, wobei die Verkehrsnachrichten in einem standardisierten Aufbau übertragen werden. Den Verkehrsnachrichten selbst wird dabei ein Header vorangestellt und der digitalen Verkehrsmeldung wird mindestens eine weitere Information nachgeordnet, wobei diese Information eine Ortsbeschreibung enthält. Durch die erfindungsgemäße Maßnahme wird erreicht, daß auch Verkehrsmeldungen übertragen werden können, die im standardisierten Aufbau nicht möglich oder nicht vorgesehen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01); H04H 60/07 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/092 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 60/07 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19905893 A1 20000817; EP 1030475 A2 20000823; EP 1030475 A3 20050511; US 6996089 B1 20060207

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20160624

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060905

2006-02-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-01-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20051111

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RUF, MICHAEL

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KERSKEN, ULRICH

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DORENBECK, CLAUS

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT,HEINRICH

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HEMPEL, KARIN

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI