Global Patent Index - EP 1030537 A2

EP 1030537 A2 2000-08-23 - Glass ceramic cooking hob with at least a cooking zone and process for displaying a cooking zone indication

Title (en)

Glass ceramic cooking hob with at least a cooking zone and process for displaying a cooking zone indication

Title (de)

Glaskeramik als Kochfläche mit mindestens einer Kochzone und Verfahren zur Darstellung einer Kochzonenanzeige

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson en vitro-céramique avec au moins une zone de cuisson et procédé pour l'affichage de l'indication de la zone de cuisson

Publication

EP 1030537 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122455 A

Priority

DE 19906737 A

Abstract (en)

The bottom surface of the glass-ceramic plate (1) is provided with an opaque layer (2) with a pattern of transparent sections (1a) which serve to indicate one or more cooking zones. Also claimed is a method for producing such a glass-ceramic plate. It involves use of screen printing technology for application of a patterned opaque layer.

Abstract (de)

Moderne Kochfelder besitzen eine Glaskeramikplatte (1) als Kochfläche, die mindestens eine Kochzone aufweist, der typischerweise ein Strahlungsheizkörper zugeordnet ist. Zur Anzeige der Kochzone und ggf. zur Restwärmeanzeige ist es bekannt, dem Heizkörper einen fremd beleuchteten Glasring zuzuordnen, der von oben als Lichtring optisch wahrnehmbar ist. Durch Aufbringen einer Maske auf den Glasring kann auch eine strukturiert beleuchtete Kochzonenanzeige erzielt werden. Die Herstellung der Maske ist teuer. Ferner ist die Handhabung bei der Montage des Kochfeldes aufwendig. Die Erfindung sieht vor, daß auf der Unterseite der Glaskeramikplatte (1) direkt eine lichtundurchlässige Deckschicht (2) mit entsprechend der gewünschten Struktur innerhalb der Kochzonenanzeige transparenten Bereichen aufgebracht ist. Dieses Aufbringen erfolgt vorzugsweise durch Aufdrucken eines temperaturbeständigen lichtundurchlässigen Lackes mittels Siebdruck. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/74; F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030537 A2 20000823; EP 1030537 A3 20020123; DE 19906737 A1 20000914; PL 338487 A1 20000828; US 6369365 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050105

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT AG

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI