Global Patent Index - EP 1030570 A1

EP 1030570 A1 2000-08-30 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROTECTING UMBRELLAS WITH A FERRULED TIP

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROTECTING UMBRELLAS WITH A FERRULED TIP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHÜTZEN EINES SCHIRMES

Title (fr)

METHODE ET DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE PARAPLUIES A POINTE A VIROLE

Publication

EP 1030570 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98951662 A

Priority

  • IT 9800288 W
  • IT PR970059 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920141A1] The invention falls within the sector relating to umbrellas. A protection device comprises a tubular body (1) which acts as a reservoir and is provided with a single opening through which the umbrella (3) is inserted and is provided with a manual actuator (7) for causing sliding of the tubular body (1) over the pleats of the umbrella, bringing it from a condition where it completely surrounds the closed pleats into a position where it is folded up in the zone of tip (2) inside the manual actuator (7), and vice versa. The invention also relates to the associated method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 25/28; A45B 25/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 25/24 (2006.01); A45B 25/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 25/24 (2013.01); A45B 25/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920141A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920141 A1 19990429; DE 69804655 D1 20020508; EP 1030570 A1 20000830; EP 1030570 B1 20020403; IT 1296406 B1 19990625; IT PR970059 A1 19990422; IT PR970059 D0 19971021

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101019

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091019

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-08-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2003-01-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-07-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804655 20020508

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

2002-04-03 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-05-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR PROTECTING UMBRELLAS WITH A FERRULED TIP

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL