Global patent index - EP 1030576 A1

EP 1030576 A1 2000-08-30 - UNIVERSAL CATEGORY MANAGEMENT SHELF SYSTEM

Title (en)

UNIVERSAL CATEGORY MANAGEMENT SHELF SYSTEM

Title (de)

UNIVERSELLES REGALSYSTEM ZUM EINRICHTEN NACH KATEGORIE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME UNIVERSEL DE RAYONNAGE DESTINE A LA GESTION DE CATEGORIES

Publication

EP 1030576 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98954594 A

Priority

  • GB 9803432 W
  • US 96859997 A
  • US 96997597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925220A1] An extendable shelf assembly mounted on a first and a second slotted upright, comprising a first extender bar affixed to the first slotted upright, a second extender bar affixed to the second slotted upright, the first extender bar including slots, a front rail, a back rail, a first side rail and a second side rail cooperatively defining a shelf frame, and a first and a second rotatable sprocket affixed to the shelf frame. The shelf frame slides between a plurality of fixed positions along the extender bar as the first sprocket engages the slots of the first extender bar and the second sprocket engages the slots of the second extender bar. The first and second sprockets are affixed to an axle that runs parallel to the back rail. The first and second sprockets comprise a plurality of teeth that engage the slots of the extender bars. The extendable shelf assembly may further comprise a position locking mechanism affixed to the shelf frame, the position locking mechanism comprising a tab and an extension, the extension engaging one of the slots of the first extender bar and preventing the shelf frame from sliding between positions. The extendable shelf assembly may also comprise a metal biasing apparatus coupled to the shelf frame, the biasing apparatus engaging the extension and forcing the extension to enter one of the slots of the first extender bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 46/00; A47B 57/04; A47B 96/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 46/00 (2006.01); A47B 57/04 (2006.01); A47B 57/40 (2006.01); A47B 96/02 (2006.01); A47F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/0093 (2013.01); A47B 46/00 (2013.01); A47B 57/045 (2013.01); A47B 96/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925220A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925220 A1 19990527; AU 1165099 A 19990607; AU 732458 B2 20010426; BR 9815626 A 20001024; DE 69804656 D1 20020508; DE 69804656 T2 20030206; EP 1030576 A1 20000830; EP 1030576 B1 20020403; JP 2001522676 A 20011120; JP 3380804 B2 20030224

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-06-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804656

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-08

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-03-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-06-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: EXTENDABLE SHELF ASSEMBLY

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB