Global Patent Index - EP 1030579 A1

EP 1030579 A1 2000-08-30 - CRIB

Title (en)

CRIB

Title (de)

KINDERBETT

Title (fr)

LIT D'ENFANT A BARREAUX

Publication

EP 1030579 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962214 A

Priority

  • DE 9803241 W
  • DE 19749454 A
  • DE 19842285 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19851244A1] The cot frame sections (2) forming the cot side walls contain at least one integral toy element such as an activity centre (3) or sliding figure (4), which is moved along guide bars (6, 7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47D 15/00; A63H 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47D 7/00 (2006.01); A47D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47D 15/00 (2013.01); A47D 7/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923917A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI LU MC NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851244 A1 19990610; AT 222719 T 20020915; AU 1749299 A 19990531; DE 19851243 A1 19990527; EP 1030579 A1 20000830; EP 1030579 B1 20020828; US 6269496 B1 20010807; WO 9923917 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805347

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091204

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061106

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061106

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021119

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805347 20021002

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI LU MC NL

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222719 T 20020915

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000325

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI LU MC NL