Global Patent Index - EP 1030581 A1

EP 1030581 A1 2000-08-30 - DEVICE FOR CARRYING EATING AND DRINKING TABLEWARE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CARRYING EATING AND DRINKING TABLEWARE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRAGEN VON ESS- UND TRINKGERÄTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR PORTER DES ARTICLES DE TABLE POUR REPAS ET BOISSONS

Publication

EP 1030581 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98954837 A

Priority

  • NL 9800638 W
  • NL 1007520 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923921A1] Device for carrying eating and drinking tableware, comprising a support surface (1) on which the eating and drinking tableware can be placed, the support surface being provided with a carrying arm (2) which extends from the support surface (1) to a position above the support surface (1), in the vicinity of the upwards perpendicular (5) leading from the centre of gravity (S) of the support surface (1), at which position a handle (4) is connected to the carrying arm (2) by means of a movable connection, in which device the movable connection comprises a coupling piece (3) made from an elastically deformable material, which coupling piece (3) is flexible to such an extent that movement of the handle (4) with respect to the carrying arm (2) and the support surface (1) which is connected thereto is permitted, and is torsionally rigid to such an extent that a rotation of the handle (4) about its longitudinal axis results in a rotation of the support surface (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 23/0616 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923921A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923921 A1 19990520; AU 1178599 A 19990531; DE 69813279 D1 20030515; DE 69813279 T2 20040129; EP 1030581 A1 20000830; EP 1030581 B1 20030409; NL 1007520 C1 19990517

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INNOESSENTIALS INTERNATIONAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051104

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-05-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050511

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050509

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050509

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-09 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050509

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050503

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL