Global Patent Index - EP 1030592 A1

EP 1030592 A1 2000-08-30 - NON-INVASIVE TURBULENT BLOOD FLOW IMAGING SYSTEM

Title (en)

NON-INVASIVE TURBULENT BLOOD FLOW IMAGING SYSTEM

Title (de)

BILDERZEUGUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR NICHT-INVASIV GEMESSENE TURBULENTE BLUTSTRÖMUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE NON INVASIF POUR ECOULEMENT SANGUIN TURBULENT

Publication

EP 1030592 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97947373 A

Priority

US 9720186 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923940A1] A non-invasive methodology and instrumentation for the detection and localization of abnormal blood flow in a vessel of a patient, are described. An array of sensors (131) is positioned on an area of a patient's body above a volume in which blood flow may be abnormal. Signals detected by the sensor array (13) are processed to display an image which may indicate the presence or absence of abnormal blood flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 7/04 (2006.01); A61B 8/06 (2006.01); G01S 7/52 (2006.01); G01S 15/89 (2006.01); G01S 7/521 (2006.01); G01S 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 15/8979 (2013.01); A61B 7/04 (2013.01); G01S 7/52036 (2013.01); A61B 8/4405 (2013.01); G01S 7/5205 (2013.01); G01S 7/52073 (2013.01); G01S 7/52077 (2013.01); G01S 7/52079 (2013.01); G01S 15/52 (2013.01); G01S 15/8906 (2013.01); G01S 15/899 (2013.01); G01S 15/8993 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923940 A1 19990520; AU 5247198 A 19990531; EP 1030592 A1 20000830; EP 1030592 A4 20040407

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060207

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARRIS CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060207

2004-04-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040223

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61B 5/02 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01S 15/89 B

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01S 7/52 B

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61B 8/06 B

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE