Global Patent Index - EP 1030671 A1

EP 1030671 A1 2000-08-30 - COMBINATION OF SR 57746 AND ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE INHIBITING AGENTS FOR TREATING SENILE ALZHEIMER DEMENTIA

Title (en)

COMBINATION OF SR 57746 AND ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE INHIBITING AGENTS FOR TREATING SENILE ALZHEIMER DEMENTIA

Title (de)

WIRKSTOFFKOMBINATION AUS SR 57746 UND ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE-HEMMERN FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON SENILER DEMENZ DES ALZHEIMERTYPES

Title (fr)

ASSOCIATION DU SR 57746 ET D'AGENTS INHIBITEURS DE L'ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DEMENCE SENILE DU TYPE ALZHEIMER

Publication

EP 1030671 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98954538 A

Priority

  • FR 9802384 W
  • FR 9714322 A
  • FR 9714324 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925363A1] The invention concerns a pharmaceutical composition containing as active principles: a constituent (a) selected between 1-(2-napht-2-ylethyl)-4-(3-trifluoromethylphenyl)-1,2,3,6-tetrahydropyridin and a compound (I) in which: Y represents -CH- or -N-; R1 represents hydrogen, a halogen, a hydroxyl, a CF3, a (C3-C4)alkyl or (C1-C4) alkoxyl group; R2 represents hydrogen, a halogen, a hydroxyl, a CF3, (C3-C4) alkyl or( C1-C4)alkoxyl group; R3 and R4 represent each hydrogen or a (C1-C4)alkyl; X represents (a) a (C3-C6)alkyl; a (C3-C6)alkoxyl; a (C3-C7)carboxyalkyl; a (C1-C4)alkoxycarbonyl(C3-C6-)alkyl; a (C3-C7)carboxyalkoxyl; or a (C1-C4)alkoxycarbonyl(C3-C6)alkoxyl; (b) a radical selected among a (C3-C7)cycloalkyl, (C3-C7)cycloalkyloxy, (C3-C7)cycloalkylmethyl, (C3-C7)cycloalkylamino and cyclohexenyl, said radical capable of being substituted by a halogen, hydroxy, (C1-C4)alkoxy, carboxy, (C1-C4)alkoxycarbonyl, amino, mono- or di-(C1-C4)alkyamino or (c) a group selected among phenyl, phenoxy, phenylamino, N-(C1-C3)alkyl-phenyl-amino, phenylmethyl, phenylethyl, p henylcarbonyl, phenylthio, phenylsulphonyl, phenylsulphinyl and styryl, said group capable of being mono- or polysubstituted on the phenyl group by a halogen, CF3, (C1-C4)alkyl, (C1-C4)alkoxy, cyano, amino, mono- or di-(C1-C4)alkylamino, (C1-C4)acylamino, carboxy, (C1-C4)alkoxycarbonyl, aminocarbonyl, mono- or di-(C1-C4)alkylaminocarbonyl, amino(C1-C4)alk yl, hydroxy(C1-C4)alkyl, or halogeno(C1-C4)alkyl; optionally in the form of one of its pharmaceutically acceptable salts; and an constituent (b) active in the symptomatic treatment of DAT, optionally in the form of one of its pharmaceutically acceptable salts, provided that when constituent (a) is other than 1-(2napht-2-ylethyl)-4-(3-trifluoromethylphenyl)-1,2,3,6-tetrahydropyridin or one of its pharmaceutically acceptable salts, the constituent (b) is an acetylcholinesterase inhibiting agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/645; A61K 31/445

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4418 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/4409 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/473 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/445 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/00 + A61K 31/44
  2. A61K 31/445 + A61K 31/44
  3. A61K 31/00 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 31/445 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925363A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925363 A1 19990527; AU 1160999 A 19990607; AU 743228 B2 20020124; BG 104428 A 20010831; BG 64819 B1 20060531; BR 9814035 A 20000926; CA 2309966 A1 19990527; CN 1243540 C 20060301; CN 1285742 A 20010228; CO 4980891 A1 20001127; DZ 2649 A1 20041228; EA 003255 B1 20030227; EA 200000412 A1 20001225; EE 04235 B1 20040216; EE 200000290 A 20010615; EP 1030671 A1 20000830; HU 0100098 A2 20010730; HU 0100098 A3 20011228; ID 24933 A 20000831; IL 136122 A 20060705; IL 136122 D0 20010520; IS 5482 A 20000509; JP 2001523642 A 20011127; MY 120461 A 20051031; NO 20002450 A 20000714; NO 20002450 D0 20000511; NZ 504420 A 20030829; OA 11464 A 20031118; PL 194597 B1 20070629; PL 340500 A1 20010212; SK 286040 B6 20080107; SK 7112000 A3 20001009; TR 200001262 T2 20010122; TW 585766 B 20040501; UY 25247 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028354

2008-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080313

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/4418 20060101AFI20070905BHEP

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/445 20060101ALI20070905BHEP

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/473 20060101ALI20070905BHEP

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 45/06 20060101ALI20070905BHEP

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 25/28 20060101ALI20070905BHEP

2007-10-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMBINATION OF SR 57746 AND ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE INHIBITING AGENTS FOR TREATING SENILE ALZHEIMER DEMENTIA

2004-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANOFI-AVENTIS

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010717

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000614;LT PAYMENT 20000614;LV PAYMENT 20000614;MK PAYMENT 20000614;RO PAYMENT 20000614;SI PAYMENT 20000614