Global Patent Index - EP 1030684 A1

EP 1030684 A1 2000-08-30 - MODIFIED ANTIBODIES WITH ENHANCED ABILITY TO ELICIT AN ANTI-IDIOTYPE RESPONSE

Title (en)

MODIFIED ANTIBODIES WITH ENHANCED ABILITY TO ELICIT AN ANTI-IDIOTYPE RESPONSE

Title (de)

MODIFIZIERTE ANTIKÖRPER MIT VERSTÄRKTER FÄHIGKEIT EINE ANTI-IDIOTYPISCHE ANTWORT AUSZULÖSEN

Title (fr)

ANTICORPS MODIFIES A CAPACITE AMELIOREE DE DECLENCHEMENT D'UNE REPONSE ANTI-IDIOTYPE

Publication

EP 1030684 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958584 A

Priority

  • US 9824303 W
  • US 6571697 P
  • US 8140398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925379A1] The invention relates to modified immunoglobulin molecules in which one or more variable region residues that form intrachain disulfide bonds are substituted with amino acid residues that do not contain sulfydryl groups, such that the intrachain disulfide bond does not form. Such immunoglobulin molecules have an enhanced ability to elicit an anti-idiotype response. The invention further provides for the methods of prevention and treatment of cancer and/or infectious diseases using the modified immunoglobulins of the invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/395; C07K 16/08; C07K 16/12; C07K 16/20; C07K 16/30; C07K 16/42; C12N 5/12; C12N 15/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); C07K 7/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/08 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); C07K 16/20 (2006.01); C07K 16/30 (2006.01); C07K 16/42 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/4266 (2013.01); C07K 7/18 (2013.01); C07K 16/00 (2013.01); C07K 16/3046 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); C07K 2317/565 (2013.01); C07K 2318/10 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925379 A1 19990527; AU 1459799 A 19990607; AU 1459899 A 19990607; AU 2003252902 A1 20031106; AU 737457 B2 20010823; AU 763029 B2 20030710; BR 9815289 A 20011226; BR 9815580 A 20020129; CA 2309990 A1 19990527; CA 2310269 A1 19990527; CN 1294517 A 20010509; CN 1327388 A 20011219; EP 1030684 A1 20000830; EP 1030684 A4 20040915; EP 1032420 A1 20000906; EP 1032420 A4 20040915; IL 136113 D0 20010520; IL 136114 D0 20010520; JP 2001526021 A 20011218; JP 2002507544 A 20020312; WO 9925378 A1 19990527; WO 9925378 A9 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1032201

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060515

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060622

2004-09-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040730

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE