Global Patent Index - EP 1030684 A4

EP 1030684 A4 20040915 - MODIFIED ANTIBODIES WITH ENHANCED ABILITY TO ELICIT AN ANTI-IDIOTYPE RESPONSE

Title (en)

MODIFIED ANTIBODIES WITH ENHANCED ABILITY TO ELICIT AN ANTI-IDIOTYPE RESPONSE

Title (de)

MODIFIZIERTE ANTIKÖRPER MIT VERSTÄRKTER FÄHIGKEIT EINE ANTI-IDIOTYPISCHE ANTWORT AUSZULÖSEN

Title (fr)

ANTICORPS MODIFIES A CAPACITE AMELIOREE DE DECLENCHEMENT D'UNE REPONSE ANTI-IDIOTYPE

Publication

EP 1030684 A4 20040915 (EN)

Application

EP 98958584 A 19981113

Priority

  • US 9824303 W 19981113
  • US 6571697 P 19971114
  • US 8140398 P 19980410

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925379A1] The invention relates to modified immunoglobulin molecules in which one or more variable region residues that form intrachain disulfide bonds are substituted with amino acid residues that do not contain sulfydryl groups, such that the intrachain disulfide bond does not form. Such immunoglobulin molecules have an enhanced ability to elicit an anti-idiotype response. The invention further provides for the methods of prevention and treatment of cancer and/or infectious diseases using the modified immunoglobulins of the invention.

IPC 1-7

A61K 39/395; C07K 16/08; C07K 16/12; C07K 16/20; C07K 16/30; C07K 16/42; C12N 5/12; C12N 15/13

IPC 8 full level

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); C07K 7/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/08 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); C07K 16/20 (2006.01); C07K 16/30 (2006.01); C07K 16/42 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

A61P 31/00 (2018.01); A61P 31/04 (2018.01); A61P 31/18 (2018.01); A61P 35/00 (2018.01); A61P 37/02 (2018.01); C07K 7/18 (2013.01); C07K 16/00 (2013.01); C07K 16/3046 (2013.01); C07K 16/4266 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); C07K 2317/565 (2013.01); C07K 2318/10 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); Y02A 50/30 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9411509 A2 19940526 - CANCER RES FUND OF CONTRACOSTA [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9608514 A1 19960321 - TSANG KWONG Y [US], et al
  • [X] K. PROBA ET AL.: "A natural antibody missing a cysteine in VH: Consequences for thermodynamic stability and folding.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 265, no. 2, 17 January 1997 (1997-01-17), pages 161 - 172, XP004462317
  • [A] L. REIDL ET AL.: "Structural basis of a conserved idiotope expressed by an autoreactive human B cell lymphoma. Evidence that a VH CDR3 mutation alters idiotypy and specificity.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 147, no. 10, 15 November 1991 (1991-11-15), BALTIMORE, MD, USA, pages 3623 - 3631, XP002287487
  • [A] H. HOLZMANN ET AL.: "Assessment of the antigenic structure of tick-borne encephalitis virus by the use of synthetic peptides.", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, vol. 74, no. 9, September 1993 (1993-09-01), pages 2031 - 2035, XP002287488
  • [T] "Patent evaluation: Site-specific structural modification of monoclonal antibodies for therapeutic application.", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, vol. 10, no. 2, 2000, pages 251 - 253, XP002288085
  • See also references of WO 9925379A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 9925379 A1 19990527; AU 1459799 A 19990607; AU 1459899 A 19990607; AU 2003252902 A1 20031106; AU 737457 B2 20010823; AU 763029 B2 20030710; BR 9815289 A 20011226; BR 9815580 A 20020129; CA 2309990 A1 19990527; CA 2310269 A1 19990527; CN 1294517 A 20010509; CN 1327388 A 20011219; EP 1030684 A1 20000830; EP 1030684 A4 20040915; EP 1032420 A1 20000906; EP 1032420 A4 20040915; IL 136113 D0 20010520; IL 136114 D0 20010520; JP 2001526021 A 20011218; JP 2002507544 A 20020312; KR 20010015817 A 20010226; KR 20010015818 A 20010226; WO 9925378 A1 19990527; WO 9925378 A9 19990812

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 9824303 W 19981113; AU 1459799 A 19981113; AU 1459899 A 19981113; AU 2003252902 A 20031010; BR 9815289 A 19981113; BR 9815580 A 19981113; CA 2309990 A 19981113; CA 2310269 A 19981113; CN 98813117 A 19981113; CN 98813119 A 19981113; EP 98958583 A 19981113; EP 98958584 A 19981113; IL 13611398 A 19981113; IL 13611498 A 19981113; JP 2000520811 A 19981113; JP 2000520812 A 19981113; KR 20007005263 A 20000515; KR 20007005264 A 20000515; US 9824302 W 19981113