Global Patent Index - EP 1030739 A1

EP 1030739 A1 2000-08-30 - VISCOUS LIQUID APPLICATOR METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (en)

VISCOUS LIQUID APPLICATOR METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (de)

AUFTRAGSGERÄT- UND METHODE FÜR VISKOSE- FLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION POUR LIQUIDES VISQUEUX ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1030739 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98940954 A

Priority

  • US 9817055 W
  • US 92092097 A
  • US 92471797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911389A2] An apparatus for applying to a surface a viscous liquid includes a wand (18) having a handle (20), an elongated tubular barrel (22), an angled adapter (24), and a sharp-edged spray tip (26), one of the barrel or the angled adapter being directly connected to the handle while the other of the barrel or the angled adapter being directly connected to the tip. The handle, the barrel and the adapter are arranged such that when the handle is held by an operator in an ergonomic position the axis of the adhesive spray emanates from the tip at approximately ninety (90) degrees to the surface. The elongated tubular barrel has a length between about one and one-half (1.5) and about four (4) feet.

[origin: WO9911389A2] An apparatus for applying to a surface a viscous liquid includes a wand having a handle, an elongated tubular barrel, an angled adapter, and a sharp-edged spray tip, one of the barrel or the angled adapter being directly connected to the handle while the other of the barrel or the angled adapter being directly connected to the tip. The handle, the barrel and the adapter are arranged such that when the handle is held by an operator in an ergonomic position the axis of the adhesive spray emanates from the tip at approximately ninety (90) degrees to the surface. The elongated tubular barrel has a length between about one and one-half (1.5) and about four (4) feet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/20 (2006.01); B05B 9/04 (2006.01); B05B 9/08 (2006.01); B05B 15/06 (2006.01); B05D 1/02 (2006.01); B05B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 9/007 (2013.01); B05B 9/0403 (2013.01); B05B 15/065 (2013.01); B05D 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911389A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911389 A2 19990311; WO 9911389 A3 20021003; AR 013456 A1 20001227; AU 737255 B2 20010816; AU 8911398 A 19990322; BR 9814449 A 20011023; CA 2302464 A1 19990311; CA 2302464 C 20030527; DE 69819195 D1 20031127; DE 69819195 T2 20040609; EP 1030739 A1 20000830; EP 1030739 B1 20031022; JP 2003513769 A 20030415; JP 3613463 B2 20050126

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070818

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060818

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-04-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060818

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050811

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050803

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-08-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69819195

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-11-20 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04F 21/00 A, 7E 01C 19/17 B, 7A 47G 27/00 B, 7B 05D 1/26 B, 7B 05B 9/08 B, 7B 05B 9/01 B

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL