Global Patent Index - EP 1030740 A1

EP 1030740 A1 2000-08-30 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING AND SORTING OBJECTS CONVEYED ON A BELT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING AND SORTING OBJECTS CONVEYED ON A BELT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN UND SORTIEREN VON BANDGEFÖRDERTEN OBJEKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'IDENTIFICATION ET LE TRI D'OBJETS TRANSPORTES SUR BANDE

Publication

EP 1030740 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961191 A

Priority

  • DE 19751862 A
  • EP 9807267 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19751862A1] Using color cameras (12,22,26) the position, form, contour, size, color and texture of the object are first monitored and appropriate characteristic values stored. The nature of the object material is then determined by NIR spectroscopy (13,14) with the infrared beam concentrated on one measurement point only. Selective ejection of objects is then performed based on the camera and spectroscope results.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 5/34; B07C 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/342 (2006.01); B07C 5/34 (2006.01); B07C 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/34 (2013.01); B07C 5/361 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926734A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19751862 A1 19990527; DE 19751862 C2 20020919; AT 206961 T 20011115; AU 1669999 A 19990615; CA 2310838 A1 19990603; EP 1030740 A1 20000830; EP 1030740 B1 20011017; ES 2166193 T3 20020401; JP 2001523574 A 20011127; WO 9926734 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121114

2014-03-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140305

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121113

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121113

2013-08-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121113

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121113

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 206961

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121113

2013-06-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PRIESE LUTZ

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101111

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TITECH VISIONSORT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-01-07 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20030817

2003-08-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: TITECH VISIONSORT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-12-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TITECH VISIONSORT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-12-11 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Free Format Text: TITECH VISIONSORT GMBH

2002-09-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UHLMANN VISIOTEC GMBH

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2166193

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2002-01-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020105

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI

2001-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 206961

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010613

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI