Global patent index - EP 1030746 A1

EP 1030746 A1 2000-08-30 - PRECISION-ROLLING METHOD

Title (en)

PRECISION-ROLLING METHOD

Title (de)

PRÄZISIONSWALZVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE LAMINAGE DE PRECISION

Publication

EP 1030746 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98949818 A

Priority

  • AT 9800255 W
  • AT 193297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925499A1] The present invention relates to a precision rolling method intended for producing rolled products (1) in the shape or rods or wires while respecting the shape and size allowances. In order to provide good accessibility to the rolling stands (15, 16), the method of the present invention comprises combining the following properties: rolling the product to be rolled (1) in at least one dual rolling stand (15) with an open pass (5) starting from any cross section in order to produce a rolled product (1) with a polygonal and essentially tetragonal cross section; and guiding the rolled product (1) into another rolling stand (16) following a path of a predetermined length along one or more longitudinal edges and/or along the surfaces of said product (1) which are adjacent to the longitudinal edges, and subsequently rolling the same so as to obtain a rolled product (1) with a round cross section in at least one closed pass (6). During the rolling process, the rolling forces are applied in the form of a star from at least three direction so as to deform the rolled product (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/18; B21B 13/10; B21B 39/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/16 (2006.01); B21B 1/18 (2006.01); B21B 13/10 (2006.01); B21B 39/14 (2006.01); B21B 31/02 (2006.01); B21B 31/04 (2006.01); B21B 31/10 (2006.01); B21B 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 39/14 (2013.01); B21B 1/18 (2013.01); B21B 13/103 (2013.01); B21B 31/04 (2013.01); B21B 31/103 (2013.01); B21B 35/10 (2013.01); B21B 2031/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925499A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925499 A1 19990527; AT 406644 B 20000725; AT A193297 A 19991215; DE 59804086 D1 20020613; EP 1030746 A1 20000830; EP 1030746 B1 20020508; JP 2001523575 A 20011127; JP 4316796 B2 20090819; US 6216517 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111022

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111021

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59804086

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111021

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101018

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804086

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-13

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-10-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE