Global Patent Index - EP 1030749 A1

EP 1030749 A1 2000-08-30 - APPARATUS FOR UNWINDING A STRIP FROM A COIL

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR UNWINDING A STRIP FROM A COIL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABWICKELN EINES BANDES VON EINER SPULE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DEROULER UNE BANDE A PARTIR D'UNE BOBINE

Publication

EP 1030749 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98945454 A

Priority

  • IB 9801556 W
  • SE 9703699 A
  • US 94895397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919094A1] An apparatus for unwinding a strip (2) from a coil (3) and feeding the strip (2) to an assembly (4) for processing the strip (2) has a rotatable table (10) for supporting the coil (3) and a drive unit (12, 13) for rotating the coil-supporting table (10). The drive unit (12, 13) has a driving gear (12) which meshes with a toothed periphery of a gear ring (11) mounted on the table (10) and which is driven by a motor (13). Further, the appparatus has a device (20, 21) for guiding and tensioning the strip (2) between the coil-supporting table (10) and the processing assembly (4). This device (20, 21) includes a pivotable arm (20) having a strip-guiding unit (21) which is movable towards and away from the coil-supporting table (10) by pivoting of the arm (20), and means (26) for controlling the movement of the arm (20) and thereby the movement of the strip-guiding unit (21) in accordance with the strip-feeding rate and the rotational speed of the coil-supporting table (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 57/28 (2006.01); B21C 47/00 (2006.01); B21C 47/18 (2006.01); B21C 47/20 (2006.01); B65H 23/185 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/185 (2013.01); B65H 2301/3251 (2013.01); B65H 2511/21 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2553/21 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/21 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919094A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29721131 U1 19980409; AT 233136 T 20030315; AU 9277298 A 19990503; DE 69811712 D1 20030403; DE 69811712 T2 20030918; EP 1030749 A1 20000830; EP 1030749 B1 20030226; JP 2001519240 A 20011023; WO 9919094 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071007

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071007

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071007

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *SPIRO

- Effective date: 20071031

2006-11-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-10-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-05-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-05-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-05-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811712 P 20030403

2003-04-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV RO SI

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPIRO SA

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020416

2002-05-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LINDSO, SVEIN, ARNE

2002-05-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OTTESEN, BJORN

2001-01-02 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000505;LV PAYMENT 20000505;RO PAYMENT 20000505;SI PAYMENT 20000505