Global Patent Index - EP 1030781 A1

EP 1030781 A1 2000-08-30 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PAGE BY PAGE CONVEYANCE OF A PRE-PRINTED STRIPLIKE RECORDING MEDIUM IN A PRINTER

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PAGE BY PAGE CONVEYANCE OF A PRE-PRINTED STRIPLIKE RECORDING MEDIUM IN A PRINTER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SEITENGERECHTEN TRANSPORT EINES VORBEDRUCKTEN, BAHNFÖRMIGEN AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGERS IN EINEM DRUCKER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT PAGE PAR PAGE D'UN SUPPORT D'IMPRESSION PREIMPRIME SOUS FORME DE BANDE DANS UNE IMPRIMANTE

Publication

EP 1030781 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955562 A

Priority

  • DE 19749596 A
  • EP 9807172 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19749596C1] The paper web feed control method uses uniform optical markings (109) provided along the edge of the paper web (5), detected by a sensor (59) during a start phase, for supplying a signal to a drive control (100), for identifying each new page, the spacing between the markings used for calculating the page length, used for controlling the subsequent transport rate of the paper web during printing. An independent claim is included for a device for controlling the tractor-less paper web feed in an electrographic printer.r electrographic printer using continuous paper web.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/46; B41J 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/46 (2006.01); B41J 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 15/06 (2013.01); B41J 11/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924264A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19749596 C1 19990325; CA 2309596 A1 19990520; CA 2309596 C 20070410; EP 1030781 A1 20000830; EP 1030781 B1 20020911; JP 2001522742 A 20011120; US 6402405 B1 20020611; WO 9924264 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131110

2014-10-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140904 AND 20140910

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-09-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805548

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131110

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20131130

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805548 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB