Global patent index - EP 1030782 A1

EP 1030782 A1 2000-08-30 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING A PRE-PRINTED STRIPLIKE RECORDING MEDIUM IN A PRINTING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING A PRE-PRINTED STRIPLIKE RECORDING MEDIUM IN A PRINTING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORT EINES VORBEDRUCKTEN, BAHNFÖRMIGEN AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGERS IN EINEM DRUCKGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSPORTER UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT EN FORME DE BANDE PRE-IMPRIMEE DANS UNE IMPRIMANTE

Publication

EP 1030782 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965663 A

Priority

  • DE 19749656 A
  • EP 9807171 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924263A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for controlling a drive unit (13) which conveys a striplike laterally pre-printed recording medium (5), whereby a sensor is sensitized with respect to a regularly re-occurring mark (109) of the recording medium (5). The recording medium (5) is continuously scanned by the sensor (59) during the printing operation and the speed at which the recording medium (5) is conveyed is adjusted according to the scanned signals from the sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/46; B41F 13/02; G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/46 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/6517 (2013.01); B41J 11/46 (2013.01); B41P 2233/50 (2013.01); B41P 2233/52 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00455 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924263A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924263 A1 19990520; EP 1030782 A1 20000830; EP 1030782 B1 20010530; US 6256474 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800807

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800807

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131110

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-10-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140904 AND 20140910

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131110

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59800807

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800807

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800807

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800807

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-09-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800807

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-07-05

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB