Global patent index - EP 1030937 A1

EP 1030937 A1 2000-08-30 - BRISTLES OR INTERDENTAL CONSISTING OF A MONOFIL

Title (en)

BRISTLES OR INTERDENTAL CONSISTING OF A MONOFIL

Title (de)

BORSTEN ODER INTERDENTALREINIGER AUS EINEM MONOFIL

Title (fr)

POILS DE BROSSIERIE OU ELEMENTS NETTOYANTS INTERDENTAIRES DE MONOFILAMENT

Publication

EP 1030937 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962315 A

Priority

  • DE 19748733 A
  • EP 9806954 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748733A1] The invention relates to a monofil which has reduced secondary bonding forces and which consists of at least two coextruded polymers, for producing bristles or interdental cleaning elements which can be slit in an essentially axial direction by means of mechanical forces. The aim of the invention is to obtain defined slits or flags. To this end, the two polymers contained in the monofil have a geometrically regular arrangement with the boundary layers in which the reduced secondary bonding forces are present running in an essentially axial direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 8/04; A46D 1/00; A61C 15/04; D01F 8/06; D01F 8/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/00 (2006.01); A61C 15/04 (2006.01); A61C 17/00 (2006.01); D01F 8/04 (2006.01); D01F 8/06 (2006.01); D01F 8/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/023 (2013.01); A46D 1/00 (2013.01); A46D 1/0238 (2013.01); A46D 1/0261 (2013.01); A46D 1/0292 (2013.01); D01F 8/04 (2013.01); D01F 8/06 (2013.01); D01F 8/12 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924649A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748733 A1 19990506; AR 010957 A1 20000712; AU 1753399 A 19990531; AU 749645 B2 20020627; BR 9813195 A 20000829; CA 2308848 A1 19990520; CN 1105198 C 20030409; CN 1278309 A 20001227; EG 21972 A 20020531; EP 1030937 A1 20000830; EP 1030937 B1 20040519; ES 2219925 T3 20041201; JP 2001522948 A 20011120; PL 194178 B1 20070531; PL 340384 A1 20010129; RU 2197572 C2 20030127; TR 200001242 T2 20000921; TW 440615 B 20010616; WO 9924649 A1 19990520; ZA 9810077 B 19990507

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2011-05-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PEDEX GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59811434

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110304

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081104

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20081104

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081103

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081103

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081103

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PEDEX & CO. G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PEDEX & CO. G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2219925

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811434

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-01-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BRISTLES OR INTERDENTAL CONSISTING OF A MONOFIL

2003-12-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BRISTLES OR INTERDENTAL CONSISTING OF A MONOFIL

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020705

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL