Global Patent Index - EP 1030939 A1

EP 1030939 A1 2000-08-30 - METHOD AND CALENDER FOR TREATING A SHEET

Title (en)

METHOD AND CALENDER FOR TREATING A SHEET

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND KALANDER ZUM BEHANDELN EINER BAHN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET CALANDRE POUR TRAITER UNE BANDE

Publication

EP 1030939 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954375 A

Priority

  • DE 29720192 U
  • EP 9806390 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6395211B1] A calender for treatment of a web of a nonwoven textile V made of thermoplastic fibers. The calendar includes a heated embossing roller made of steel and a counter-roller that runs at the same circumference velocity. The local plastification in the nonwoven textile V that is produced at the locations of the raised embossing areas results in a board-like feel of the nonwoven textile V. To reduce this hardness, the web of the nonwoven textile V is broken, after having cooled at least partially.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/54; D04H 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/54 (2012.01); D04H 3/14 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/54 (2013.01); D04H 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925911A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29720192 U1 19990325; EP 1030939 A1 20000830; EP 1030939 B1 20020116; JP 2001523772 A 20011127; US 6395211 B1 20020528; WO 9925911 A1 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081008

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071008

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071008

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061004

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802673 20020221

2002-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EDUARD KUESTERS MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT