Global Patent Index - EP 1030960 A1

EP 1030960 A1 2000-08-30 - FAST POWER REGULATING PROCESS FOR A STEAM GENERATING POWER PLANT AND STEAM GENERATING POWER PLANT

Title (en)

FAST POWER REGULATING PROCESS FOR A STEAM GENERATING POWER PLANT AND STEAM GENERATING POWER PLANT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SCHNELLEN LEISTUNGSREGELUNG EINER DAMPFKRAFTANLAGE SOWIE DAMPFKRAFTANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REGULER RAPIDEMENT LA PUISSANCE D'UNE CENTRALE THERMIQUE A VAPEUR ET CENTRALE THERMIQUE A VAPEUR

Publication

EP 1030960 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959765 A

Priority

  • DE 9803153 W
  • DE 19749452 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19749452A1] The object of the invention is to ensure a fast, economical and reliable power regulation of a steam generating power plant (1) having a turbo set that comprises a steam turbine (2) and a generator (6) and during the operation of which water (W) is injected into or upstream of an overheater heating surface. According to the disclosed fast power regulating process of the steam generating power plant (1), the injection rate of water (W) is increased to adjust an additional generator output. In a steam generating power plant (1) which is particularly suitable for carrying out the process, an overheater heating surface of a steam generator (28) is provided with a water injector (70, 71) connected to a regulating component (82) for regulating the injection rate of water (W) into the overheater heating surface. The regulating component (82) supplies a regulating signal to the water injector (70, 72) depending on the required additional generator output.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 13/02; F22G 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01K 13/02 (2006.01); F01K 25/04 (2006.01); F22G 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 13/02 (2013.01); F22G 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924698A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19749452 A1 19990520; DE 19749452 C2 20010315; CA 2309058 A1 19990520; CA 2309058 C 20070213; CN 1143947 C 20040331; CN 1277653 A 20001220; EP 1030960 A1 20000830; EP 1030960 B1 20020807; ES 2182377 T3 20030301; ID 24120 A 20000706; JP 2001522964 A 20011120; JP 4343427 B2 20091014; MY 118855 A 20050131; RU 2209320 C2 20030727; US 6301895 B1 20011016; WO 9924698 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151015

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151016

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151005

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182377 T3

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805131 20020912

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI SE