Global Patent Index - EP 1030966 A1

EP 1030966 A1 2000-08-30 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR HIGH-PRESSURE INJECTION WITH IMPROVED FUEL SUPPLY CONTROL

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR HIGH-PRESSURE INJECTION WITH IMPROVED FUEL SUPPLY CONTROL

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFF-EINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR HOCHDRUCK-EINSPRITZUNG MIT VERBESSERTER STEUERUNG DER KRAFTSTOFFZUFUHR

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR INJECTION HAUTE PRESSION AVEC COMMANDE AMELIOREE DE L'AMENEE DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1030966 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99938131 A

Priority

  • DE 9901649 W
  • DE 19827267 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827267A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve for high-pressure fuel injection from a high-pressure storage tank to a combustion chamber of an internal combustion engine, more particularly, a diesel engine. The fuel injection valve has a solenoid valve serving to lower (injecting position) or to build up (closing position) fuel pressure in a control chamber (3) by means of a throttle (4) having at least one throttle channel segment (5) defined by channel walls. According to the invention, the throttle channel segment (5) is essentially embodied in the shape of or as a throttle orifice.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 2200/28 (2013.01); F02M 2547/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966191A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827267 A1 19991223; EP 1030966 A1 20000830; EP 1030966 B1 20031112; JP 2002518628 A 20020625; US 6371084 B1 20020416; WO 9966191 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907711

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907711

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-11-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-05-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907711 P 20031218

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020918

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT