Global Patent Index - EP 1030967 A1

EP 1030967 A1 2000-08-30 - FUEL INJECTOR

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTOR

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1030967 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936257 A

Priority

  • DE 9901476 W
  • DE 19827137 A
  • DE 19853102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6299079B1] A fuel injector for fuel-injection systems of internal combustion engines includes two preassembled, independent assemblies. A functional part includes an electromagnetic circuit and a sealing valve, while a connection part is formed mainly by a hydraulic connection and an electrical connection. In the ready-mounted injector, electrical connecting elements and hydraulic connecting elements of both assemblies cooperate, thus ensuring a reliable electrical and hydraulic connection An extrusion coat in the interconnection region provides mechanical joining of both assemblies, great stability of the valve and sufficient imperviousness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06; F02M 51/00; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 51/005 (2013.01); F02M 51/0664 (2013.01); F02M 51/0667 (2013.01); F02M 51/0682 (2013.01); F02M 61/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966196A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6299079 B1 20011009; EP 1030967 A1 20000830; EP 1030967 B1 20030806; JP 2002518632 A 20020625; JP 4243430 B2 20090325; WO 9966196 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110518

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070518

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070518

2006-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906502 P 20030911

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT